Trustees THE DOROTHY PARKES CENTRE
Charity number: 1093189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sara Moore | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ravi Harsh | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amardeep Singh | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Johnson | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zaida Sauda Nembhard | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Andrews | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|||||
JULIE MARY McKIRDY | Trustee | 21 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL LEONARD MARTIN | Trustee | 21 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RICHARD INGRAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE KETURHA JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STAN WILLIETS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.