Trustees Halkyn Parish Hall
Charity number: 1098160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Lister | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Frank Palmer | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Robert D'Arcy | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dylan Huw Roberts | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Grant Roberts | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA RICHARDSON | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS DELYTH JANE TAYLOR | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN COLECLOUGH | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GLYN COLECLOUGH | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|||||
LESLEY HOWARD MORRIS | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE THOMAS ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPHINE WENDY SIGSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.