Trustees THE FRIENDS OF HILBRE
Charity number: 1103822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Forshaw | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary McMillan | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Tony Lamberton | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter George Hinton | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|||||
David John Gregson | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 27 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA FLORENCE BURTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET LONGWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.