Trustees EAST END HOMES LIMITED
Charity number: 1107691
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Gray | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
SIMON ANDREW TUREK | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Kenneth Edward Peter Beech | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Wing Fai Wu | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Palmer | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqui Bateson | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Philip Henderson | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Forhana Begum | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marek Andrzej WILUSZYNSKI | Trustee | 21 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jahangir Mannan | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN JOHN MOORE | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carol Mary Hinvest | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.