Trustees SUFFOLK ARTLINK
Charity number: 1110898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH JANE BARDWELL | Chair | 21 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Damian Hebron | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Price | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anscombe | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Rose Godden | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Robert Wood | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Guy-Pearson | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Maddie Baker-Woods | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Mary Dyball | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Katherine Jane Axon | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|||||
ALICE WHITNEY | Trustee | 16 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jeni Susan Draper | Trustee | 15 December 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.