Governing document PAVILION DANCE SOUTH WEST LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/07/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/08/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/09/2013 as amended on 30 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO CREATE, UNDERSTAND, WATCH AND TAKE PART IN THE ART OF DANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.