Trustees Brading Roman Villa Trust
Charity number: 1128326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Richard Derrick Bailey | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Nigel Alan Hartley | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Katherine Elizabeth Collins | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Meirion Davies | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Revell | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Suzanne Garbett | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Jane Kitching | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angela Buckley | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Woodifield | Trustee | 29 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Haigh | Trustee | 29 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Arabella Janson | Trustee | 29 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEWART DALE WHITE | Trustee | 15 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Professor Michael Gordon Fulford | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|||||
REV CANON DAVID MICHAEL LOW MA | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Patricia Mary Barber | Trustee | 19 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.