Trustees WEST SOMERSET METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1134273
Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Chloe Jones | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev LINDA BARRIBALL | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clare Robinson | Trustee | 09 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Carol Elizabeth Janet Gill | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Claire Aileen Williams | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daphne Mary West | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Ruth Jennings | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Longhurst | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Haydn Sperring | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Hedgecock | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Lynne Wooldridge | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Gillian Mary Tapp | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev JANE MARGARET SPERRING | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MERVYN THOMAS BRANFIELD | Trustee | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER LOCKHART HAMSHERE | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ARMIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET CATHERINE LINTERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rodney John Ettery | Trustee |
|
||||||
CLIVE CHARLES WOOLDRIDGE | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH ROSE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET FLORENCE NEVELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS LIZ LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET IRENE HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICK ARMIN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.