Trustees CENTRAL NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1134271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
57 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Eames | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Foster | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Fox | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Pamela Yaxley | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Jones | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan Amos Bell | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Flood | Trustee | 28 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Sandra Simm | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Junge | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rita Cumberland | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Moden | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Constantine | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anne Richardson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Marian Dolphin | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Elizabeth Lodge | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN COLMAN | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Horton | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Woodfin | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Martin John Neave | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Mary Allen LRAM, ARCM | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Sarah Louise Rodgers | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Skinner | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
John Anthony Cawood Hey | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Olwyn Brough | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marion Perryman | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Richmond | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN EWIN | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANN ELIZABETH MORGAN | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAGGIE BLUNDELL | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANA PENGELLEY | Trustee | 20 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE BERYL BALDRY | Trustee | 20 August 2013 |
|
|||||
SALLY MARY MARTIN | Trustee | 26 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER MARY PARLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSELYN BUNTING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH CATHERINE SOUTHERLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAZEL MARY YARHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Aileen Fox | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE ROSEMARY WOOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN LYNN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER GEOFFREY FULCHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THELMA ANN DAVEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JO TRICK | Trustee |
|
||||||
HELEN ELIZABETH DYE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR FRED GARNER | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN SPARKES HULL MA, B.ED. | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER JOHN GWATKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELSIE IVY WARBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AVRIL ELIZABETH TEMPLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA MEREDITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY ANN HULL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VERONICA MARY LITTLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIPPA MARY COOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAT HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW ERNEST DURRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERYL ROSE EWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV ROSEMARY WAKELIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AILSA JARDINE WARBURTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.