Trustees THE NENE VALLEY CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1135896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Lesley Dinham | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ELLIS | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Craggs | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elderton | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Moss | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Busch | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Rollings | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE KIRK | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Sally Hudson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Jennings | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Ingram | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Brenda Surtees | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Russell Green | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zena Zakis | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Thompson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Wilson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Neild | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Elizabeth Perkins | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Whitney | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Willmott | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Alun Rees | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Margaret Gladys Griffin | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Edna Treadwell | Trustee | 01 September 2009 |
|
|
||||
NITA GOULD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH HELEN AUSTEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIE ARMITAGE | Trustee |
|
||||||
JONATHAN DANIEL THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
SYLVIA PATERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA PATRICIA DUNKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KELVIN WILLIAM NOBLES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.