Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS WESTCLIFF
Charity number: 1128009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev TOM LOH | Chair | 20 October 2014 |
|
|||||||||
CATHERINE ROSANNE DARBY | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
BENJAMIN WILLIAM WYLIE | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
WENDY ELIZABETH GOULD | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
KAYODE KUFORIJI | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
DOUGLAS ALLEN WHITING | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
SHIRLEY YVONNE PARK | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Grace Kathleen Forrai | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
MICHAEL SIMMONDS | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
ALAN VAUGHAN PROSSER | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Emma Athalinda Shierlaw Douglas | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
NICOLAS JACQUES PUCENOT | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
GILLIAN LINDA HOLMES | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
PETER ERIC THOMAS | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
JOSEPHINE OSBORNE | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD MARTIN ELLARD BROWN | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
WAI CHING MOK | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.