Trustees EMSWORTH METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1127747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David John Muskett | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Gillian Richardson | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Marilyn Jane Carroll | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Geraldine Wade | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Stephen John Richardson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Diana Christina Elizabeth Elliott | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Watson | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Margaret Beechey | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Gregory BSc PhD | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
ALAN JOHN HICKOX | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Marian Coles | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Marian Hughes | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Susan Janet Dudman | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA HICKOX | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANA HARRIS | Trustee | 16 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALISON MARGARET VAUGHAN | Trustee | 16 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS DOT WARREN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JONATHAN SAWYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ANN SAWYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS GILL COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY WILLIAM EARDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.