Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WORPLESDON
Charity number: 1128100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Alexandra Blaise Russell | Chair | 21 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Jane Kerby | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Mary Broughton | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Bower-Wood | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Steven Reeds | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Carol Caven | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Pocock | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Pocock | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Warren | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Shaw | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Williams | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Davison | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna da Costa Santos | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PETER LYNCH | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL FRANK SHAW | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.