Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESTIASTICAL PARISH OF CLAYGATE
Charity number: 1128476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Patrick John Bateman | Chair | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Evenden Matthews | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Jane Reeve | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judy Madavo MBA | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lee Roome | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Marion Watkins | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Carey-Jane Hamper | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Beth Poppy Sadler | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Tanner | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Kenneth Chapman | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Edward Rugg | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clifton | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Shine MB BS | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Anne Schmidt | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Richard John Nepean Aylmer-Hall | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Reid | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PRESTON CAMERON SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN HOWELLS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.