Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, SOUTHPORT
Charity number: 1129342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Day | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lang | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jim Tate | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Rowe | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven Taylor | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret King | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keran Lewis | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Stephen | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Sexton | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Rachel Rawcliffe | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hester Taberner | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katy Porter | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice Lovegrove | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Porter | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Griffiths | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Angela Lewis | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hague | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH LACEY | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.