Trustees HULL (CENTRE AND WEST) METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1132962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
59 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev louisa Haynes | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA USHER MBE | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Jarrad Stephen Plater BSc, Msc | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JUNE CARR | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Wilson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Sanderson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Elaine Parker | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Brazendale | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN TROTTER | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Josephine Brameld | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Brameld | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Millicent Plant | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Shepherdson | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Malcolm Johnson | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Moll B Lib | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Hickson | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Barrie Thompson | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Short Bsc | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FREDERICK ANTHONY WARD CMATH FIMA | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
William Dickson KING | Trustee | 29 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Roger David Waites | Trustee | 29 August 2017 |
|
|||||
JEAN ELSIE WARD | Trustee | 29 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
William Roger Bryan-Smith | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Vi Barker | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Kerridge | Trustee | 18 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anne Harrison | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Sykes | Trustee | 25 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Neil Sanderson | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Stephen George Hunter | Trustee | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jean Rippon | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
James Michael Kerridge | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Major | Trustee | 22 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM WILLIAM SLATER | Trustee | 22 September 2014 |
|
|||||
John Robert Wilson | Trustee | 04 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Taylor | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
REV MARGARET JEAN Asiedu MA | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR MYRTLE CRAIG MB CHB DA | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW STEAD BA PGDIP | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA VINCE | Trustee | 02 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEITH GIBSON | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN ROBERT APPLEYARD B SC | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANET BARBARA GLEN | Trustee | 04 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH KERRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDITH MARY JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN KAY HUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GAIL PAULINE APPLEYARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV GWEN NEWTON BTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL ELIZABETH GRANGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV JANET WHELAN MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN DALBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE FRANCES RICHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN BARBARA WEATHERALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev RANDALL JOE BARLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP DAVISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN NOEL KERRIDGE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MALCOLM HAROLD LUCAS | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROY KENNINGTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
SHEILA MARGARET GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM COGRAVE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.