Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ALKMUND'S, WHITCHURCH. SHROPSHIRE.
Charity number: 1129900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Robert Williamson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Martin | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Hilda Francis-Roberrs | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Celia Mary Moverley Churchill | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
MELANIE ANN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Steve White | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Sheila Chase | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Rylands | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Meriel Edge | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Pauline Green | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
DAVID FISHER | Trustee | 29 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN CASTLEDINE | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
PAULINE STOKES | Trustee | 18 February 2013 |
|
|||||||
ELAINE BUCKNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN WALTER STOKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
THOMAS RYLANDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.