Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER WESTON FAVELL
Charity number: 1130591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Musson | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Gillian Cooper | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Brian Chapman | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev'd Canon Beverley Jayne Hollins | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|||||
MAJOR Robert John Walker | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Wendy Elizabeth Wheeler | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|||||
John Michael Hicks | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Elizabeth Pestell | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joy Margaret Elizabeth Matsell | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sue Cross | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Phil Norris | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clare Shaw | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clare Pearce | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ros Watt | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLARE FELICITY PEARCE | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHARLES FAZACKERLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr PETER J HALSTEAD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.