Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JAMES, SHIRLEY, SOUTHAMPTON
Charity number: 1130875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DANIEL ALASTAIR CLARK | Chair | 12 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Esther Ridsdale | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Ian Watson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Evans | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH HOARE | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ugochi Sandra Okoli | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Snape | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Peter Arbery | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Anne Gray | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Young | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Jane Caveney | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Stephen Payne | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Jane King | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Smith | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Wagstaff | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr SIMON CLIFT | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|||||
ESTHER CLIFT | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|||||
David Brian Bates | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Elizabeth Brooks | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lena Phillips | Trustee | 05 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.