Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MELTON MOWBRAY
Charity number: 1132480
Charity reporting is up to date (80 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Peter Stribblehill | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Connor Parker | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dave Kitching | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Osborne | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marion Gumbrill | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francis Thomas | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Morris | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joy Stribblehill | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Mary Munton | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Parker | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY JENNIFER HUTCHIN | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Revd Dr Mary Elizabeth Barr | Trustee | 23 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Wilson | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH GEORGE WILSON | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Helen Dickinson | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Colin William Beavis | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs D G Neale | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mrs C A Shenton | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|||||
John Stephen Lloyd | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mrs L C Pearson | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS G D BEAVIS | Trustee | 06 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter Geoffrey Franklin | Trustee | 14 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
MRS H.J. MEAKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS J M PENGELLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR C E HUTCHIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS J E KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR I.A. NEALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS J. A. MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR D H WILFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR C MOULDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.