Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ALBAN, NORTH HARROW
Charity number: 1132600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sarah Elizabeth Archer | Chair | 18 August 2020 |
|
|||||||
Noah Rajan KELLY | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Aruna Chrishmal Sumedha WARNASURIYA BA LLM AAL | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
David John LOOSEMORE CEng FICE | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew GARNER Phd MA BA | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ninus Khalil KHAKO DipHe | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Supritha KOTIAN | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Morwena Eleanor JONES | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Elizabeth Spencer-Davis | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Diane TUCK BSc | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Carys Margaret Grom | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Marilyn Davies Devine | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Henry JOHNSON | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
GERARD JOSEPH DEVINE | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
Caoimhe Sweeney MSc, BSc | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Julia Thamonda Michelle Skeete Powell | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
ALISON SUZANNE VALLANCE | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
EILEEN MARGARET EGGINGTON | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
PAULINE MAY PRINCE | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.