Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN'S BOXMOOR
Charity number: 1134844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael David Macey | Chair | 19 February 2014 |
|
|||||
MARK EDWARD HARBOUR | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Dee Jane Fisher | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Lyne | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Clayton | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip William Barton | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Kingsley Proehl | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Francis Shaw | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marion Cowe | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN DAVIES | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Shaw | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carole Eileen Lewis | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE JEANETTE IOANNOU | Trustee | 19 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR RALPH STANDEN | Trustee | 08 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
DI TOVEY | Trustee | 14 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM AUSTIN GIBBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN HAYDEN GARNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JO FISHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER LEON ANGELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR J ROMBOUT | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.