Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MORTLAKE WITH EAST SHEEN
Charity number: 1132303
Charity reporting is up to date (212 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANN LOUISE NICKSON | Chair | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Hillier | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dilys Zeegan | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine McGuinness | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Wright | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Leslie Wright | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Sheldon | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Davis | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Virginia Jane Munro | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ginny Waterkeyn | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas William Rettie | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Coggins | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Judith Robinson | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mireille Jeanine Marie Therese Stanton | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Mabel Morris | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Celia Frances Catchpole | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gerard Stewart | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Francis Ring Davies | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jack Alexander Barrow | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|||||
KATHARINE SUSAN WOODHOUSE MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN DAVID BLYTHE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.