Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EARLEY ST. NICOLAS
Charity number: 1138037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynn Olasunkanmi | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian John Bethell | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ukinebo Oghogho Abu | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK HOLLOWAY | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Jane Olney | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS CONRAD WALROND | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Eleanor Gunbie | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev April Cornelia Beckerleg | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julia Jones | Trustee | 15 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jeal | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Wendy Neale | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Muriel Bryce | Trustee | 12 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE SPRATLING | Trustee | 12 March 2017 |
|
|||||
EMMA LOUISE MAJOR | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.