Trustees LICHFIELD METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1134083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
33 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev WENDY WALKER | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANN HAYES | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES PHILIP POOLE | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ACKROYD | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
SALLY HOGAN | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL BRIAN HARDING | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN MARK WOOLF | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|||||
HOWARD WILLIS | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
SUSAN PATRICIA COLEY | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID CHARLES MICHAEL BARTON | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|||||
PAUL MCDERMOTT BSC | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|||||
MARK RICHARD HAMBLY | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE MARY HICKS | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELLEN HAMBLY | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JANE PARKER | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELLEN CLAIRE GIBBON | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Susan Smith | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER STANLEY WALKER | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SHAW | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANN YATES | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kenneth Graham Howcroft | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||
BARBARA ANN BARKER | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE PHILLIPS | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||
ANNE WARDEN BROWN | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||
ANTHEA JOAN HOCKNEY | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE MCDERMOTT | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||
ALISON JANE STATHAM | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|||||
MATTHEW WILLIAM BATES | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD COLEMAN | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Keith WATTERSON | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARGARET WOOLF | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN YATES | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNE WESTOBY | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.