Trustees BAOBAB CENTRE FOR YOUNG SURVIVORS IN EXILE
Charity number: 1135407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Linda Helman | Chair |
|
||||||
Dr Tony Jaffa | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elspeth Ferguson Carruthers | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eithne Nightingale | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Souzette Shamu Mutombo | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Enla Fees | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Holly Hemming | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Dirmeik | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Herman Otto | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gill Martin | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|||||
John Clark | Trustee | 01 December 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.