Governance CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE BRITISH ISLES SOUTH DISTRICT
Charity number: 1133336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 17 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 25 August 2023: Funds received from 1167392 OLDHAM CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE
- 24 November 2023: Funds received from 1163471 BOURNEMOUTH CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE
- 20 February 2024: Funds received from 1160331 ILKESTON CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE
- 13 March 2024: Funds received from 1167270 WESTON-SUPER-MARE CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
- CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE BISD (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.