Trustees SWANSEA UNIVERSITY
Charity number: 1138342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carlos Gregorio Ashmore | Chair | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Richard David Thomas | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||||||
Phillip John Morgan | Trustee | 04 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Nan Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Josiah | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Phatsimo Mabophiwa | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Michelle Denise Lee | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Adam Jones | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Chinamerem Abigail Egwuatu | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Mahaboob Basha | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
LAURENCE JEROME CARPANINI | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Marcia Ann Sinfield | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Keshav Singhal CBE | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Catherine Tutt | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|||||||
Edward Illtyd David | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Paul Joseph Boyle | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
Professor Kathryn Anne Monk | Trustee | 27 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Angus Muirhead | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
SIR RODERICK EVANS | Trustee | 30 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.