Trustees NORTH LANCASHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity number: 1137309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alan John Hatton-Yeo | Chair | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stubbins | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Dalton | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ross Harry Simmons | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louiza Houria Cookson Rabouhi | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Denison | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hanna | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|||||
RICHARD JAN TULEJ | Trustee | 19 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WHITAKER | Trustee | 10 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
CLLR JUNE ASHWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.