Trustees EXETER DIOCESAN EDUCATION NETWORK
Charity number: 1145137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Venerable DOUGLAS JAMES DETTMER | Chair | 28 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Joanne Evans | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Isabel Marshall | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
The Right Reverend Jacqueline Ann Searle | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Deborah Eveleigh | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Robert Douglas Harris | Trustee | 09 July 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.