Trustees WALES FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS
Charity number: 1145230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
53 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ryan Watkins | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Sian Davies | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Marc Griffiths | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Terrie Savage | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Meinir Parry | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Jones | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tomos Griffiths | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aled Jones | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iwan Harper | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angharad Davies | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Bowyer | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Morgan | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iwan Parry | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Jenkins | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Joseph | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Niall Evans | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Jones | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caitlin Harley | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sioned Jones | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mared Esyllt Evans | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tomos Lewis | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
CARYL HUGHES | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lewis | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Manon Rowlands | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Phillips | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Griffiths | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Rickman | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elin Lewis | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Healey | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ella Harris | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gwen Thomas | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sion Evans | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alun Thomas | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hafina Cordiner | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dewi Davies | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Will Hughes | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ifan Davies | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elin Calan Jones | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Sioned Davies | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aled Thomas | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catrin Owen | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Jones | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Richards | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
HEDD PUGH | Trustee | 21 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Hefin Evans | Trustee | 21 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
DELUN EVANS | Trustee | 15 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caryl Haf Jones | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|||||
ALED THOMAS | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATE THOMAS | Trustee | 04 October 2014 |
|
|||||
KATIE DAVIES | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
IWAN MEIRION | Trustee | 05 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dafydd Jones | Trustee | 05 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATE ELERI MILES | Trustee | 01 October 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.