Governing document OGWEN VALLEY MOUNTAIN RESCUE ORGANISATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/03/1973 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/1973 AS AMENDED ON 16/03/1991 AS AMENDED ON 19/03/1994 AS AMENDED ON 24/03/2001 AS AMENDED ON 22/03/2003 AS AMENDED ON 14/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 10/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO SEARCH FOR AND RESCUE PEOPLE IN DIFFICULTIES IN MOUNTAINOUS REGIONS AND IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF TO DEVELOP RESCUE TECHNIQUES AND TO DISSEMINATE INFORMATION ABOUT THE ACTIVITIES OF THE ORGANISATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.