Trustees LIFE CHURCH WARRINGTON
Charity number: 1150794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Avery | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Jones | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Simcock | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Morris | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Akerman | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Seals | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Craig Prest | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Baird | Trustee | 13 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ADAM DELLER | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
SARAH DEWHIRST | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Lukas Erich Dewhirst | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.