Trustees HOME-START ST. HELENS LTD.
Charity number: 1155988
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Dodson | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Peta Grimshaw | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Ruth Hindley | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Janet Ainscough | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carmela Clarke | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CROWE | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marie Jameson | Trustee | 31 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN COLMAN MURRAY | Trustee | 27 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.