Trustees CHICHESTER CATHEDRAL FRIENDS
Charity number: 1158498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Hugh JONES | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|||||
John Melville GARDNER | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karon Jane Read | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Paul HOLLAND | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Alun Siebert | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Margaret Sarah Gibson | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN CHARLES DAVID | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Kenneth Toole-Mackson | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Pauline Margaret Sullivan | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ian Kean | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Howard Graham Castle-Smith | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.