Trustees CARE HOME VOLUNTEERS
Charity number: 1158654
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Anne Gregson | Chair | 14 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Marcus Fernley Stevens | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Alleyne | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Geary | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Heather Leake | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Marie Levin | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paula Alison Tennant | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Radevsky MA,MBA | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH PAUL TROWBRIDGE RMN RGNCPN | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.