Trustees THE PALACE TRUST
Charity number: 1160830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Hawes | Chair | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Forsey | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
The Rt Revd Dr Noel Michael Roy Beasley | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Richard Dickinson | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Right Rev Trevor Willmott | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael Minta | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Julie Wills | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS DENISON | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Boylan | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER BRUCE GRAHAM STICKLAND | Trustee | 14 April 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.