Trustees BIRMINGHAM NURSERY SCHOOLS COLLABORATION
Charity number: 1164133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Lewis | Chair | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Jackson | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Richards | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Jane Cryan | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Yewande Lawal | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Pinnegar | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Jayne Harris | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elinor Warner | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yupu Lin | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Henebury | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Davies | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Eeles | Trustee | 03 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.