Trustees FRIENDS FOR LIFE BEDFORDSHIRE
Charity number: 1165730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sangeetha Nanda Kumar | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harjinder Singh Gosal | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Suneil Shashikant Khandke | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ames Ridley | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nafiz Hasnat | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Judith Walker | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Wheatley | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Harrington | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keyur Bhatt | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.