Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL & ST GABRIEL HAMWORTHY
Charity number: 1163697
Charity reporting is overdue by 258 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Tessa Nisbet | Chair | 17 April 2018 |
|
|||||
JANET MARIAN DAVIES | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Elizabeth Sullivan | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Colin Reed | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Trent | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Ashley Dawn Ross | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Susan Maybury | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Perring | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Coates | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Harrison-Barker | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
VIV ROBERTSON | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY STOEL STAYMAN | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.