Trustees GLOUCESTER CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1168137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Moodie | Chair | 16 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Annette Hecht | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev RICHARD CLUTTERBUCK | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Helen Colson | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hamish Lionel Charters | Trustee | 16 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rob Riley | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Hurst | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Newbold Bury | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.