Trustees LLANW
Charity number: 1166349
Charity reporting is overdue by 43 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MEIRION MORRIS | Chair | 01 January 2008 |
|
|||||
Arwel Ellis Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Mari Huws | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cynan Dafydd Llwyd | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elin Bryn Williams BA | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr MENNA MACHRETH JONES | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Alice Charlotte Egerton-Kemp MBBCh | Trustee | 30 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Heledd Fflur Iago | Trustee | 23 August 2017 |
|
|||||
CELFYN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|||||
HYWEL RHYS EDWARDS | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|||||
STEFFAN RHYS MORRIS | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANGHARAD CLYWD EDWARDS B.A | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
EMRYS OWEN | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
NAN WYN POWELL-DAVIES | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.