Accounts and annual returns MAENDY YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB
Charity number: 508232
Charity reporting is up to date (127 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 September 2022 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window