Trustees SOUTHWICK METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1172433
Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Frank Okai-Sam Ph.D. | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Jane Ford | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ANN WILKINS | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MARGARET COUCHMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Elayne Edith Peacock | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PHYLLIS GWENDOLINE NICHOLLS | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Cooke | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANET COLLETT | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev ROSEMARIE ELAINE GAYE CLARKE MA | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JULIE SCARRATT | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|||||
HEATHER MCKAY | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|||||
ANNE ROSEMARY HARRIS | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE YATES | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KIM ANNE UPTON | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY JOY DIXON | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
EMILY ANNE BERRY | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER HARRIS | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Ann Quint | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Philip WEBB | Trustee | 12 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.