Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREENFIELD, ST MARY
Charity number: 1175989
Charity reporting is up to date (287 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER SHAW | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison O'Brien | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Emily Grant | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Peter Cotterill-Waring | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Ratcliff | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Pilkington | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Greenwood | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET STRANGE | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA MCGOWAN | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev BARBARA CHRISTOPHER | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|||||
SUSAN JANICE GARSIDE | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY BOTTOM | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.