Trustees WHICKHAM VOLUNTEER LIBRARY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1178050
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALLAN EDWARD SHORT BSC MSC | Chair | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DENISE LORNA BENNETT | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sacha Hayter | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Todd | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHNSON | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Jeff Bowe | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Summerson | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Bone | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
AMELIA LOUISE ORD | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER THOMAS CRAIG | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA JANE CAMPION | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON RICHARDSON | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MESSERE | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JAMES ORD | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.