Trustees SPELTHORNE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1178685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Ledger | Chair | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Turnbull | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Robert Benjamin | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Gillian Henry | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Cumber | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Richard Gray | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Darran Lee Buttigieg | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ALAN BREWER | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Denise Irene Buttigieg | Trustee | 14 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROGER ROYSTON DIX | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.