Trustees NORTHAMPTON MUNICIPAL CHURCH CHARITY
Charity number: 1182629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN CULVER MAY | Chair | 11 May 2018 |
|
|||||
David Reynolds | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Keith Holland-Delamere | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|||||
William Shearer | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Claire Richards | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Brian William Sargeant | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Flavell | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|||||
CLIVE NORMAN FOWLER | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clive Walter Brooks | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.