Trustees THE WOW FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1189880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandie Okoro | Chair | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Nazir Afzal | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Anne-Marie Imafidon MBE | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
JAYANTHI KURU-UTUMPALA | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard David COLLIER-KEYWOOD | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Shevaun Haviland | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|||||||||
NUSRATH HASSAN | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
BARBARA REEVES | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.