Governing document THE PORTHCAWL YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/04/1982 AS AMENDED ON 09/01/1984 AS AMENDED ON 07/07/1994 AS AMENDED ON 06/06/1995 AS AMENDED ON 10/06/1997
Charitable objects
FIRSTLY, TO LEAD YOUNG PEOPLE TO THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO FULNESS OF LIFE IN HIM, AND SECONDLY, TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.